CHRIST FIRST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian religion and further the gospel of God and his Son the Lord Jesus Christ and to preach and teach the Christian faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 12 May 1992: Standard registration
- 04 December 2012: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 04 December 2012: Funds transferred to 1142678 CHRIST FIRST WATFORD
- X1 (Working name)
- CHURCH OF CHRIST THE KING, WATFORD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.88k | £43.77k | £69.69k | £108.00k | £91.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.40k | £48.32k | £67.13k | £101.00k | £77.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 10 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 12 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 12 October 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 12 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 03 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 16 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 16 December 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 MARCH 1992 AS VARIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 MARCH 2002 AND AS AMENDED 27 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND FURTHER THE GOSPEL OF GOD AND HIS SON THE LORD JESUS CHRIST AND TO PREACH AND TEACH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. TO RELEIVE AGED AND OTHER PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (TO INCLUDE, BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION, ASSISTANCE, WHETHER BY WAY OF LOAN GIFT OR PROVISION OF ACCOMODATION OR OTHERWISE). TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WHETHER OF CHILDREN (ABOVE OR BELOW COMPULSORY SCHOOL AGE) OR OF ADULTS. TO SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION FROM TIME TIME DETERMINE AND TO SUPPORT INDIVIDUALS OR BODIES ENGAGED IN WORK WHICH IS CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
OXHEY, SOUTH OXHEY AND SOUTH WEST HERTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window