Accounts and annual returns LAUREL PRE SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity Number: 1010910
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2011 17 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 05 November 2011 128 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 05 November 2011 128 days late