KEY ENTERPRISES (1983) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education, training, support to adults with mental health problems and learning disabilities through the provision of workshop based employment together with horticultural activities and leisure activities taking place throughout the North East of England. The charity helps adults to regain mainstream employment and volunteering opportunities and provides support to aid recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 08 May 1992: Standard registration
- KEY ENTERPRISES (Working name)
- KEY ENTERPRISES (1983) LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER JOHN ANDREW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Janice Mole | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cliff Lawrence | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsten Whitehall | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anoop Puri | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|||||
Patrick Kilgallon | Trustee | 02 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £339.70k | £393.76k | £329.65k | £347.45k | £394.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £342.11k | £316.38k | £343.03k | £340.02k | £429.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £87.02k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 3 FEBRUARY 1992 AND 24 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE RECOVERING FROM MENTAL ILLNESS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES AND EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE NORTH TYNESIDE)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 36
North Tyne Industrial Estate
Benton
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE12 9SZ
- Phone:
- 0191 2701138
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window