Governing document ANDOVER HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/04/1992 AS AMENDED ON 23/04/1999 AS AMENDED ON 28/04/2000 AS AMENDED ON 28/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 23/03/2012 as amended on 24 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO STIMULATE AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC INTEREST IN ARCHEAEOLOGY AND LOCAL HISTORY IN AROUND ANDOVER AND TO MAINTAIN SUCH OTHER AREAS OF STUDY AND PUBLISH THE RESULTS OF SUCH STUDY AS SHALL BE EDUCATIONAL AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT APPERTAINING TO ANDOVER AND ITS LOCALITY AS THE SOCIETY FROM TIME TO TIME SHALL DECIDE
Area of benefit
ANDOVER AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.