Trustees ANDOVER HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY SOCIETY
Charity number: 1011050

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Margaret Lodge | Trustee | 26 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lois Allender | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrew Hobley | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
FELICITY COLDICOTT | Trustee | 28 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MOLE | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER NEEDHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID BORRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE HARRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.