LODDON SOCIAL ENTERPRISE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide work experience and training opportunities for people with special needs to help them develop their life skills in a safe environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £133,649 from 1 government contract(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 11 May 1992: Standard registration
- LODDEN SOCIAL ENTERPRISE LTD (Previous name)
- LODDON (CHARITABLE TRUST) LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BURT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Benjamin James West | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Anne Verney | Trustee | 27 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Frederick Hodgson | Trustee | 20 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Therese Leach | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alastair John Shier Paul | Trustee | 11 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN STRAWBRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.97k | £138.89k | £161.70k | £150.32k | £170.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £167.42k | £122.06k | £138.81k | £147.58k | £153.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £136.25k | £96.07k | £127.50k | N/A | £133.65k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.11k | £8.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/01/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/03/2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AND FOR THE REHABILITATION AND EMPLOYMENT OF MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY DISABLED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE IN BASINGSTOKE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loddon Social Enterprise Ltd
Unit
Unit 9-10
Brunswick Place
BASINGSTOKE
RG21 3NN
- Phone:
- 01256352058
- Email:
- cathy@loddonctl.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window