FEDORUK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We give small grants to people mainly in Poland who are in special need usually due to sickness, age or infirmity. We have given donations to churches in Eastern Poland for refurbishment or for their community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Poland
Governance
- 13 May 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN EDWARD DRAGE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
IAN CHARLES BRIAN HECKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAMES GEOFFREY PEASE BUXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Reverend PHILIP JONATHON O'REILLY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £5 | £5 | £5 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.33k | £0 | £40 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 10 February 2023 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 13 December 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 02 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
(I) THE RELIEF OF THE INHABITANTS OF POLAND WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF FLOOD, DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE OR OTHER NATURAL CAUSE OR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITION ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE. (II) THE TRUSTEES MAY GRANT RELIEF TO SUCH INHABITANTS THROUGH THE AGENCY OF OTHER CHARITIES. (III) IN CARRYING OUT THE TRUSTS DECLARED IN THIS DEED THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE SPECIAL REGARD TO THE IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURAL METHODS IN POLAND.
Area of benefit
POLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Hardy Close
Barton under Needwood
Burton-on-Trent
DE13 8HG
- Phone:
- 01283713412
- Email:
- brian.drage@ntlworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window