Accounts and annual returns KING'S SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1011173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 24 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 September 2024 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 05 September 2022 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 05 September 2022 462 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required