Financial history KING'S SCHOOL PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1011173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £1.54k £109 £882 £12.00k £6.02k
Total expenditure £2.20k £2.86k £1.29k £5.56k £3.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A