Financial history MILTON KEYNES WOMENS AID

Charity number: 1011284
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.11m £1.42m £1.24m £1.38m £1.60m
Total expenditure £1.08m £1.22m £1.29m £1.42m £1.54m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £598.83k £595.75k
Income from government grants £527.54k £746.72k £568.00k £598.83k £595.75k
Income - Donations and legacies £196.20k £1.01m £791.21k £952.97k £1.18m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £913.41k £412.16k £452.64k £421.71k £417.59k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £987 £290 £59 £2.10k £6.14k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £665
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.06m £1.19m £1.26m £1.37m £1.51m
Expenditure - Raising funds £19.73k £35.67k £33.42k £49.06k £26.29k
Expenditure - Governance £19.92k £12.27k £8.40k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0