MILTON KEYNES WOMENS AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
MKWA provides a holistic domestic violence service in MK, the name of the service is MK-ACT as we support women and men - emergency refuge accommodation for up to 28 families, - specialist service for Asian families - resettlement service for families leaving accommodation - Crisis Intervention Service from families in the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,599,955
Donations and legacies | £1.18m | |
Charitable activities | £417.59k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.14k | |
Other | £665 |
Total expenditure:
£1,535,943
Raising funds | £26.29k | |
Charitable activities | £1.51m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £595,750 from 1 government contract(s) and £595,750 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £26.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.51m | |
Retained for future use | £64.01k |
People

44 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 27 May 1992: Standard registration
- MKWA (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANDIP RANI KAUR | Chair | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
AGNES TUTANI | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
BALVINDER KAUR PARMAR | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Balal | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Krina Nilesh Parmar | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Taeed | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HOLLY ELIZABETH FISHER | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thandiwe Linda Mangena | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PAYNE | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.11m | £1.42m | £1.24m | £1.38m | £1.60m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08m | £1.22m | £1.29m | £1.42m | £1.54m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £598.83k | £595.75k | |
|
Income from government grants | £527.54k | £746.72k | £568.00k | £598.83k | £595.75k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £196.20k | £1.01m | £791.21k | £952.97k | £1.18m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £913.41k | £412.16k | £452.64k | £421.71k | £417.59k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £987 | £290 | £59 | £2.10k | £6.14k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £665 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.06m | £1.19m | £1.26m | £1.37m | £1.51m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.73k | £35.67k | £33.42k | £49.06k | £26.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £19.92k | £12.27k | £8.40k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.98k | £28.48k | £18.60k | £13.08k | £13.18k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £597.88k | £800.16k | £749.03k | £720.10k | £811.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £108.39k | £138.51k | £126.70k | £139.13k | £167.10k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/05/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/01/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/10/2012 as amended on 17 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
“The objects of the Charity shall be: To relieve poverty, hardship, distress and suffering by providing support and care, which may include providing emergency accommodation and / or related support, for individuals and their children who have experienced; “Abusive Behaviour or Economic Abuse” by their families or persons they are personally connected to or persons with whom they are or have been living or associating; and who may also be in need of support due to one or more illness(es) or learning disability or disabilities or mental or physical health problems or social or sensory impairment(s) or has problems with alcohol or substance abuse. “Abusive Behaviour or Economic Abuse” means physical or sexual abuse; or violent or threatening behaviour; or controlling or coercive behaviour; or economic abuse (which means any behaviour that has a substantial adverse effect to acquire, use or maintain money or other property, or obtain goods or services); or psychological, emotional or other abuse, and it does not matter whether the behaviour consists of a single incident or a course of Conduct.
Area of benefit
MILTON KEYNES IN BUCKINGHAMSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moorgate House
201 Silbury Boulevard
Milton Keynes
MK9 1LZ
- Phone:
- 01908523720
- Email:
- info@mk-act.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window