Trustees MILTON KEYNES WOMENS AID
Charity number: 1011284

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MANDIP RANI KAUR | Chair | 07 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
AGNES TUTANI | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
BALVINDER KAUR PARMAR | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Balal | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Krina Nilesh Parmar | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Elizabeth Taeed | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
HOLLY ELIZABETH FISHER | Trustee | 26 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thandiwe Linda Mangena | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PAYNE | Trustee | 20 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.