FITZROY SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 1962, FitzRoy Support ,known as FitzRoy is a national charity that provides practical support for adults with learning and physical disabilities. The service we provide is totally tailored to the wants, needs and aspirations of the individual. Our vision, mission and principles reflect our total commitment to the people we support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£53,869,427
Donations and legacies | £492.56k | |
Charitable activities | £52.26m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £210.09k | |
Other | £909.56k |
Total expenditure:
£52,996,063
Raising funds | £134.62k | |
Charitable activities | £52.86m | |
Other | £0 |
-£2,190 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £52,257,218 from 74 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £134.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £52.86m | |
Retained for future use | £873.36k |
People

1619 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 May 1992: Standard registration
- 13 December 2012: Funds received from 210205 SEARCHLIGHT WORKSHOPS
- 12 March 2014: Funds received from 1138171 SEARCHLIGHT SUSSEX
- 22 May 2015: Funds received from 1017367 THE LEO TRUST
- 19 June 2024: Funds received from 263871 THE PETERSFIELD SOCIETY FOR SPECIAL NEEDS
- ELIZABETH FITZROY SUPPORT (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Kyndt | Chair | 23 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Moth | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edwina Jane Johnston | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathon Derrick Altham | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarju Mistry | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Saad Samir Sayeed | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Carol Whetton | Trustee | 28 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil Ramsay Blackley | Trustee | 24 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Mark Andrew Sanderson | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Caroline Jacobs | Trustee | 23 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Derrick McCourt | Trustee | 03 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Evans | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £36.62m | £40.12m | £41.03m | £41.30m | £53.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.07m | £38.26m | £39.11m | £42.69m | £53.00m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £36.20m | £39.09m | £38.41m | £40.55m | £52.26m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £384.56k | £358.52k | £2.58m | £651.45k | £492.56k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £36.20m | £39.09m | £38.41m | £40.55m | £52.26m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £36.03k | £15.50k | £11.27k | £97.11k | £210.09k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £655.52k | £33.80k | £0 | £909.56k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £34.68k | £60.06k | £2.28m | £451.75k | £270.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £35.89m | £38.09m | £38.88m | £42.51m | £52.86m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £180.32k | £170.70k | £236.58k | £184.93k | £134.62k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £149.63k | £38.27k | £181.98k | £225.21k | £258.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.70m | £11.79m | £11.68m | £12.22m | £12.46m | |
|
Long-term investments | £57.78k | £65.74k | £69.13k | £67.44k | £65.26k | |
|
Other assets | £10.40m | £14.02m | £15.65m | £13.62m | £14.12m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.13m | £3.98m | £3.57m | £3.48m | £3.35m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/03/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/09/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/09/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/02/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21/03/2013 as amended on 08 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
The objects for which the Company is established are to promote in any manner which is charitable by law the benefit of people from all walks of life who have a learning or physical disability, autism or any similar disability to autism ,and/or mental health needs including (but without prejudice to the generality of the foregoing) the provision and rental of residential homes.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
FITZROY
FITZROY HOUSE
8 HYLTON ROAD
PETERSFIELD
GU32 3JY
- Phone:
- 01730711111
- Email:
- info@fitzroy.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window