Governing document THE CHARITY SERVICE LIMITED
Charity number: 1011293

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 SEPTEMBER 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 10 JANUARY 1991 AND 23 MARCH 1999 AND 5 MARCH 2004. as amended on 10 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
TO BENEFIT ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.