Trustees THE KINGSTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE
Charity number: 1011295

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Margaret Brett | Trustee | 29 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Cura | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Mayeda | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Hine | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Hinchsliffe | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Neal Cheek | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Margaret Hellen | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Diane Wilson | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOY CAROL GARVEY | Trustee | 30 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.