Accounts and annual returns BEXLEY MOORINGS PROJECT

Charity number: 1011299
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 16 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 07 January 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2008 18 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 18 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 19 November 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 28 November 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 September 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 05 October 2006 On Time