Financial history BEXLEY MOORINGS PROJECT

Charity number: 1011299
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £148.83k £136.59k £142.35k £156.71k £166.92k
Total expenditure £153.24k £136.60k £147.04k £147.69k £166.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A