5TH BECKENHAM SOUTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity Number: 1011301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The purpose of Scouting is to contribute to the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £200,948
Total expenditure: £166,100

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Oliver Colville Chair 16 January 2017
None on record
Nick Chrumka Trustee 25 January 2023
None on record
Raymond Gerard Tierney Trustee 29 November 2021
None on record
Catherine Jane Godart-Smith Trustee 28 November 2021
None on record
Christopher Charles Jones Trustee 22 January 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Madge Martin Trustee 08 May 2018
None on record
Donal Patrick Joseph Mullane Trustee 08 May 2018
None on record
Timothy Mark Younge Trustee 29 January 2018
None on record
Mr Andrew Dawe Trustee 15 January 2018
None on record
David Alan Barber Trustee 25 January 2016
None on record
Adam Robert Young Trustee 17 September 2011
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER Charles MARTIN Trustee 13 September 2011
None on record
Elizabeth Jane Butler Trustee 23 June 2003
None on record
PHILIP COLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £193.92k £15.30k £131.44k £176.55k £200.95k
Total expenditure £176.11k £25.05k £83.29k £151.73k £166.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 18 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 18 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 27 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 Elm Road
BECKENHAM
Kent
BR3 4JB
Phone:
02086588623