THE WILLIAM HEATH ROBINSON TRUST IN MEMORY OF JOAN BRINSMEAD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assemble and preserve works and other chattels created by the late William Heath Robinson or by any other artist or designer of sufficient merit whose work may in the opinion of the Trustees be displayed in conjunction with that of Heath Robinson. To provide and promote access thereto for and by the general public and further and disseminate education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 May 1992: Standard registration
- THE WILLIAM HEATH ROBINSON TRUST (Working name)
- JOAN BRINSMEAD MEMORIAL TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr PETER HIGGINSON | Chair |
|
||||||
CHRIS LINTOTT | Trustee | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Owen | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELINOR ANNE GARRAWAY | Trustee | 08 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERALDINE JOAN BEARE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MARY COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEOFFREY CHARLES BEARE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.48k | £76 | £0 | £0 | £15.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.26k | £3.98k | £2.00k | £2.47k | £3.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 9TH AUGUST 1993
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Devonshire Place
Brighton
BN2 1QB
- Phone:
- 07941290174
- Email:
- peterhigginson@me.com
- Website:
-
heathrobinson.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window