FRIENDS OF THE WELLCOME LIBRARY AND CENTRE FOR THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 May 1992: Standard registration
- 11 October 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- FWLC (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WELLCOME INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2004 | 28 September 2005 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2004 | 28 September 2005 | 28 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 APRIL 1992 AS AMENDED ON 8 DECEMBER 1997 AND 23RD OCTOBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE SUPPORT AND FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATIONAL AIMS OF THE WELLCOME LIBRARY FOR THE HISTORY AND UNDERSTANDING OF MEDICINE AND THE WELLCOME TRUST CENTRE FOR THE HISTORY OF MEDICINE, UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window