Accounts and annual returns SKIN DEEP

Charity Number: 1011334
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2007 06 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 06 February 2008 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 08 March 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not Required