THE WELLBEING TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the use of complementary therapies to work alongside conventional medicine in improving health and healthcare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 May 1992: Standard registration
- 30 August 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE SPEEDWELL AND WELLBEING TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390 | £1.15k | £999 | £181 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £651 | £1.14k | £711 | £315 | £140 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF ALL NON TOXIC METHODS OF HEALING AND NATURAL THERAPIES DESIGNED TO RELIEVE HUMAN SUFFERING AND DISTRESS. 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE NON TOXIC METHODS OF HEALING AND NATURAL THERAPIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window