THE QUEEN'S OWN GURKHA LOGISTIC REGIMENT REGIMENTAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the regiment financially with grants for adventurous training, chattels, accoutrments & other items that are not adequately, or directly, provided for out of public funds. This contributes directly towards the maintenance of morale & enhances the efficiency of the regiment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nepal
Governance
- 27 May 1992: Standard registration
- THE GURKHA TRANSPORT REGIMENT TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- THE QUEEN'S OWN GURKHA TRANSPORT REGIMENT TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RSM Lok Sunawar QOGLR | Trustee | 20 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Michael Ruocco RLC | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Basantahoj Shahi QOGLR | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Giles Sugdon QOGLR | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Brigadier Patrick Simon Reehal MBE | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
COLONEL GILHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GENERAL COPELAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.64k | £31.70k | £26.73k | £28.14k | £30.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.41k | £7.74k | £32.78k | £20.16k | £26.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02/04/1992 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 03/02/1997 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14/10/2011 as amended on 15 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
(A) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE REGIMENT AND THE MAINTENANCE OF ITS HISTORY, TRADITIONS AND ESPRIT DE CORPS. (B) THE PURCHASE OF CHATTELS AND SUCH OTHER PROPERTY AS IN THE OPINION OF THE MANAGING TRUSTEES IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE REGIMENT OR OF ANY UNITS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE REGIMENT AND THE INSURANCE AND UPKEEP OF ANY PROPERTY FOR THE TIME BEING BELONGING TO THE REGIMENT OR ANY SUCH UNIT. (C) OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OR ESPRIT DE CORPS OF ALL THE RANKS OF OR SERVING WITH THE REGIMENT - INCLUDING WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND AMENITIES NOT PROVIDED FOR OUT OF PUBLIC FUNDS. (D) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS, HARDSHIP OR POVERTY AMONGST SERVING OR FORMER MEMBERS OF THE BRIGADE OF GURKHAS OR THEIR DEPENDANTS BY THE PROVISION OR APPLICATION OF SUCH MONIES WHETHER BY LOAN OR GIFT AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES CONSIDER TO BE NECESSARY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE INDEPENDENT SERVICES AGENCY LTD
PO BOX 314
WEST END
WOKING
GU24 9FA
- Phone:
- 01276855825
- Email:
- isvcsagency@easynet.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window