ST MARY'S CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL P T F A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Mary's PTFA welcomes all parents, family and friends of pupils attending St. Mary's Catholic Primary School, Brewood, Staffordshire. This is a small village school with approximately 90 pupils. The PTFA holds social and fund-raising events throughout the year in support of the school and the children's education. All the funds raised go towards providing equipment and educational resources tha
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 27 May 1992: Standard registration
- ST MARY'S P T F A (Working name)
- ST MARY'S PTA (Working name)
- ST MARY'S R C PRIMARY SCHOOL P T A (Previous name)
- ST MARY'S R C PRIMARY SCHOOL P T F A (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Candice Claire Morgan | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
katherine Tilston | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Joanne Minton | Trustee | 22 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.92k | £1.39k | £546 | £5.17k | £3.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.62k | £2.91k | £1.06k | £3.88k | £3.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 07 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 26 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 1999 AND 9 JUNE 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Marys Catholic Primary School
Wharf Lane
Brewood
STAFFORD
ST19 9BG
- Phone:
- 01902850261
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window