HARROGATE ARTS AND MERCER GALLERY DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises money by fundraising and receiving donations, specifically for the purchase of art and meet expenses to stage exhibitions in the gallery. These activities allow the public, both local and visiting, together with schools over a wide area to appreciate a diverse range and variety of art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 28 May 1992: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF THE MERCER ART GALLERY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Thomas King | Chair | 06 November 2019 |
|
|||||
Marion Jane Hancock | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Sheradan Hunter | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jane Ogden | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Perveen Aslam | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul David Greening | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.93k | £11.35k | £16.78k | £34.53k | £16.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.69k | £2.68k | £36.95k | £31.76k | £38.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 13 March 2024 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 14 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FINE ARTS BY ASSISTING IN THE ACQUISITION AND EXHIBITION TO THE PUBLIC OF WORKS OF ART WHICH SHALL INCLUDE, BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO, PAINTINGS, SCULPTURE AND FURNITURE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Honeysuckle House
Crimple Lane
Follifoot
HARROGATE
North Yorkshire
HG3 1DF
- Phone:
- 01423 550260
- Email:
- mercergallerytrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window