DRINKSENSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drinksense works to reduce the harm to individuals, families and communities which is caused by alcohol and other substance misuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 29 May 1992: Standard registration
- 07 October 2020: Removed (Does not operate)
- DRINKSENSE (Working name)
- CAMBRIDGESHIRE ALCOHOL ADVISORY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/07/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £807.27k | £728.86k | £213.59k | £159.42k | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £770.86k | £748.59k | £307.51k | £288.43k | £119.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £709.36k | £656.34k | £134.02k | £100.52k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £5.22k | £5.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £370 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £800.78k | £720.63k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £903 | £1.03k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £765.52k | £748.59k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.34k | £5.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 27 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2018
(These accounts |
27 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 23 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 23 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24TH JULY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
TO REDUCE THE HARM CAUSED TO INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND COMMUNITIES BY ALCOHOL AND RELATED SUBSTANCE MISUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window