Financial history DRIFFIELD MALE VOICE CHOIR

Charity number: 1011443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.98k £2.12k £3.45k £8.65k £13.01k
Total expenditure £11.79k £3.09k £3.45k £11.63k £12.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A