BALKWELL COMMUNITY WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PARENT AND TODDLER GROUP SLIMMING GROUPS LINE DANCING TEA DANCE (sequence) CARD CRAFT GROUP CHILDREN'S DANCE CLASS MONTHLY SOCIALS NORTH SHIELDS SPIRITUALIST CHURCH PRIVATE PARTY HIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 29 May 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDE DAVIES | Chair | 07 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Carlisle | Trustee | 12 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Smith | Trustee | 04 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CAMPBELL | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|||||
JAMES DAVEY | Trustee | 07 December 2016 |
|
|||||
EDWARD DAVEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
BRIAN COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MALCOLM HOLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMA NORVELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.05k | £25.15k | £27.81k | £33.77k | £42.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.80k | £12.12k | £18.47k | £41.79k | £46.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.69k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11 APRIL 1950
Charitable objects
THE SOCIAL,MORAL AND PHYSICAL WELL BEING OF THE COMMUNITY RESIDENT IN THE BALKWELL AREA OF THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF TYNEMOUTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL,MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT AND TO FOSTER A COMMUNITY SPIRIT FOR THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THESE AND OTHER SUCH PURPOSES AS MAY BY LAW BE DEEMED TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
BALKWELL AREA AND IMMEDIATE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 TUDOR AVENUE
NORTH SHIELDS
NE29 0RY
- Phone:
- 01912583607
- Email:
- balkwellhut@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window