WILDERNESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environmental protection and enhancement Education in traditional crafts, arts, sustainable living, natural sciences and heritage Promotion of the arts Relief of suffering by inclusion of marginalised people in communal life and work and by providing a place of temporary refuge or respite
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
110 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FRANCES CAROLINE BLOCKLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keran Symmonds | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Price | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Maddocks | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jasminka O'Hora | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Duerden | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Johnathan Hall | Trustee | 13 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Merlin Sebastian Blockley | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
URSULA FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.09k | £80.25k | £65.96k | £148.84k | £59.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.15k | £85.06k | £48.52k | £93.07k | £58.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £918 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 16 NOVEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE AND REHABILITATE PERSONS WHO ARE MENTALLY ILL OR HAVE BEEN CONVICTED OF A CRIMINAL OFFENCE OR ARE SUFFERING FROM ADDICTION TO ALCOHOL OR DRUGS BY THE PROVISION OF A CENTRE FACILITIES AND COUNSELLING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bethel Hall
Bethel Street
LLANIDLOES
Powys
Llaidloes
SY18 6BS
- Phone:
- 01686 413857
- Email:
- franblockley@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window