Accounts and annual returns HARLYN SCHOOL FUNDRAISING ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1011580
Charity reporting is up to date (38 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 08 July 2024 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 June 2023 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 13 June 2022 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 August 2021 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 June 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required