FRIENDS OF THE WEALD

Charity Number: 1011586
Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a school pta who provide fund raising events for the children and their families to attend. The funds we spend on improving the school grounds and work alongside the school development plan.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £4,175
Total expenditure: £2,440

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 June 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin Bramhill Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £10.66k £12.94k £3.76k £1.85k £4.18k
Total expenditure £8.06k £12.11k £3.65k £2.48k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 322 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 December 2022 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 10 September 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Weald C of E Primary School
Newdigate Road
Beare Green
DORKING
RH5 4QW
Phone:
01306711719