FOREIGN AND COMMONWEALTH OFFICE WELFARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of financial assistance in cases of hardship to members and former members of H M Diplomatic Service and to widows, children and dependents of members, through the provision of loans and grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 05 June 1992: Standard registration
- FCDO Welfare Fund (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Kemp | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Leo McKell | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Griffin | Trustee | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £4.59k | £3.63k | £4.60k | £6.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.16k | £1.62k | £1.62k | £1.62k | £3.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14 JANUARY 1992
Charitable objects
1)RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S DIPLOMATIC SERVICE AND AMONGST THE WIDOWS, CHILDERN AND AMONGST THE WIDOWS, CHILDERN AND DEPENDENTS OF SUCH MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS. 2)RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF HER MAJESTY'S HOME CIVIL SERVICE WHO ARE SERVING OR WHO HAVE SERVED WITH THE FOREIGN AND COMMONWEALTH OFFICE OR DIPLOMATIC SERVICE POST OVERSEAS AND AMONGST THE WIDOWS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDENTS OF SUCH MEMBERS OR FORMER MEMBERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ryan Griffin
FCDO
King Charles Street
London
SW1A 2AH
- Phone:
- 07557 863009
- Email:
- fcdo.welfarefund@fcdo.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window