FRIENDS OF PARK SURGERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Park Surgery seeks to support patients by provision of medical equipment & transport services to the practice. Educational meetings and a quarterly newsletter promote the work of FOPS and coffee mornings provide an opportunity for members to socialise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Foord | Chair | 10 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Trelawney Friggens | Trustee | 08 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pavlos Afisidis | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Gordon Sinclair | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr David William Holwell | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Christine Oliver | Trustee | 18 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Sturt | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lilian Bold | Trustee | 10 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.69k | £3.80k | £3.32k | £3.00k | £2.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.26k | £764 | £565 | £2.07k | £2.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 04 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 08 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/4/92 AS AMENDED ON 10 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PATIENTS REGISTERED WITH PARK SURGERY AND THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF PATIENT PARTICIPATION TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY FOSTERING THE HIGHEST POSSIBLE STANDARD OF PRIMARY MEDICAL CARE.
Area of benefit
THE PATIENTS OF PARK SURGERY HORSHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PARK SURGERY
ALBION WAY
HORSHAM
RH12 1BG
- Phone:
- 07879442084
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window