DIAL-A-DREAM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fulfilment of dreams and aspirations of children aged between 5 and 18 who are currently suffering from a diagnosed life limiting illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.90k | £138.30k | £29.87k | £13.24k | £44.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.16k | £61.54k | £50.85k | £52.26k | £57.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 21 December 2022 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH FEBRUARY 1992, AND AMENDED 10TH MAY 1992
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS AGED 18 AND UNDER WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM LIFE THREATENING OR DEBILITATING ILLNESSES BY THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAYS, TRIPS, EXCURSIONS, OUTINGS, VISITS OR JOURNEYS OR BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT OR FACILITIES AS MAY BE DEEMED TO ENHANCE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window