Heruka Kadampa Meditation Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION (NKT-IKBU) PRINCIPALLY THROUGH ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE ALL WITHIN THE MAHAYANA BUDDHIST TRADITION OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA ...
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 June 1992: Standard registration
- HERUKA CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Douglas Robb | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Reed | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Marie Devine | Trustee | 24 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £318.73k | £234.13k | £337.47k | £300.40k | £285.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.49k | £141.99k | £218.17k | £204.23k | £232.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST APRIL 1992, AS AMENDED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1994, 4TH JULY 1995 AND 2 FEBRUARY 2006 as amended on 01 Apr 2020 as amended on 15 Nov 2013
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BUDDHIST FAITH UNDER THE SPIRITUAL GUIDANCE OF THE ELECTED GENERAL SPIRITUAL DIRECTOR OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE ACTIVITIES OF TEACHING, STUDY, PRACTICE AND THE OBSERVANCE OF MORAL DISCIPLINE ALL WITHIN THE MAHAYANA BUDDHIST TRADITION OF ATISHA AND JE TSONGKHAPA AS TAUGHT BY VENERABLE GESHE KELSANG GYATSO, THE FOUNDER OF THE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION - INTERNATIONAL KADAMPA BUDDHIST UNION, THROUGH THE CONTINUOUS IMPLEMENTATION OF THE THREE NEW KADAMPA TRADITION STUDY PROGRAMMES: THE GENERAL PROGRAMME, THE FOUNDATION PROGRAMME, AND THE TEACHER TRAINING PROGRAMME, ALL AS DEFINED IN SCHEDULE A OF THE MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Woodstock Road
London
NW11 8ES
- Phone:
- 02084557563
- Email:
- info@meditateinlondon.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window