WAH KWONG CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objective of the association is to promote through charitable activities for the benefit of the inhabitants of the city of Leeds and its surrounding regions, particularly those of Chinese origin. The principal activities undertaken include the organisation of fund raising festive events,three tours and some charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leeds City
Governance
- 05 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN YON PUO LEE | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SZE LIN TAI | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
YUK WAH SUNG | Trustee | 20 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR K C PANG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £137.12k | £20.17k | £4.97k | £18.49k | £56.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.97k | £22.32k | £3.88k | £8.00k | £53.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 February 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 February 2021 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION (CHARTER ) ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1992 AS AMENDED 24 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF LEEDS (IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF CHINESE ORIGIN) AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH INHABITANTS (2) TO APPLY FUNDS TOWARDS OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
CITY OF LEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leeds Chinese Community Association
2nd Floor
84-86 North Street
LEEDS
LS2 7PN
- Phone:
- 01132430832
- Email:
- shyikco@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window