HOLY TRINITY ROTHWELL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raises funds for the preservation and restoration of Holy Trinity Church, Rothwell. Northamptonshire NN14 6BQ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 05 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sara Cosgrove | Chair | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Amanda Walton | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Marion Clements | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Giard Hawthorn | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Cooke | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Christopher Coggins | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cedwien Brown | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Saunders | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|||||
WILLIAM ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.64k | £4.46k | £1.58k | £1.44k | £2.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £860 | £0 | £300 | £1.36k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MAY 1992 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 23 FEBRUARY 1993 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 17 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION OF FUNDS TO THE COUNCIL TO BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRACTICE OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND
Area of benefit
ROTHWELL, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Jesus Hospital
Hospital Hill
Rothwell
Northamptonshire
NN14 6BL
- Phone:
- 07503733137
- Email:
- mccoggins@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window