CHAPELTOWN COMMUNITY NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of childcare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £157,920 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 08 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robin Lovelace | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Croot | Trustee | 02 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Molloy | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Curtis | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Matthews | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £153.38k | £191.50k | £215.61k | £195.69k | £261.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £208.36k | £164.59k | £193.22k | £215.54k | £267.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £80.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £99.26k | £86.02k | £122.81k | £157.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 1992
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SOCIAL WELL BEING OF CHILDREN RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT
Area of benefit
LEEDS 7 AND VICINITY BUT PRIMARILY CHAPELTOWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
REGINALD STREET
LEEDS
LS7 3HL
- Phone:
- 01132374696
- Email:
- chaptownnursery@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window