GREENHILL SENIOR CITIZENS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the welfare, and social activities for retired people. Minimum joining age 50.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 08 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY LEE | Chair | 30 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
RON WILLIAMS | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER MENZIES | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
AVRIL HARRISON | Trustee | 08 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA BOURTON | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
WENDY RANSOM | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANET BAYFIELD | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Menzies | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
THELMA ROWELL | Trustee | 30 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
MRS BERYL FUNNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN SUZANNE PULLEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.09k | £16.09k | £18.67k | £18.50k | £36.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.58k | £9.34k | £23.00k | £22.94k | £35.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £11.05k | £250 | N/A | £350 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 09 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 15 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 06 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 SEPTEMBER 1990
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE FOR THE WELFARE OF THE AGED IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN GREENHILL AT HERNE BAY KENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE GREENHILL HERNE BAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Greenhill Senior Citizens Club
Clare Drive
HERNE BAY
Kent
CT6 7QT
- Phone:
- 01227 371162
- Email:
- greenhillfriends@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window