Financial history THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF THE HOLY TRINITY, OXFORD

Charity number: 1011772
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £82.08k £58.74k £57.14k £112.18k £117.37k
Total expenditure £87.46k £57.36k £61.01k £90.84k £92.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.88k N/A N/A N/A