THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF THE HOLY TRINITY, OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's objects are to promote the Christian Orthodox faith to benefit the public in England and Wales and abroad and particularly the Greek Orthodox community by the relief of poverty sickness and distress. The Trustees seek to further these objects predominantly by raising funds to support the work of The Greek Parish in Oxford.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 June 1992: Standard registration
- GREEK PARISH OXFORD (Working name)
- Holy Trinity Greek Orthodox Parish (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pavlina Gatou | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Ranko Lazic | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandros Plianos | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Demetrios Xiourouppas | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Petkoff | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgy Krasovitsky | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Skev Antoniou | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emmanouil Karteris | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dimitrios Zilaskos | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Philip Atzemoglou | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
IOANNA CHRISTODOULOU | Trustee | 27 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GOELDNER-THOMPSON | Trustee | 27 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.08k | £58.74k | £57.14k | £112.18k | £117.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.46k | £57.36k | £61.01k | £90.84k | £92.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.88k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 12 February 2025 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 373 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 February 2025 | 373 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 19 May 2023 | 103 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/10/91
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN ORTHODOX FAITH ACCORDING TO THE RITES AND TRADITIONS OF THE GREEK ORTHODOX CHURCH AS PRESERVED AND TAUGHT BY THE ECUMENICAL PATRIARCHATE OF CONSTANTINOPLE. 2) TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND ABROAD AND PARTICULARLY THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY BY THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
ORTHODOX CHURCH
1 CANTERBURY ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 6LU
- Phone:
- 01865873735
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window