Trustees THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF THE HOLY TRINITY, OXFORD
Charity number: 1011772

Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pavlina Gatou | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Ranko Lazic | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandros Plianos | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Demetrios Xiourouppas | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Petkoff | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgy Krasovitsky | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Skev Antoniou | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emmanouil Karteris | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dimitrios Zilaskos | Trustee | 29 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr George Philip Atzemoglou | Trustee | 20 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
IOANNA CHRISTODOULOU | Trustee | 27 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GOELDNER-THOMPSON | Trustee | 27 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.