BLIND IN BUSINESS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a Training Service for blind and sight impaired teenagers to support them towards employment. We offer a comprehensive Employment Service helping school leavers, undergraduates and graduates into employment throughout the United Kingdom. We also support families, employers and professionals in all aspects of education. All with the theme of raising confidence and aspirations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
84 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 June 1992: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Cathral | Chair | 18 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alex Hannigan-Train | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rupert Timothy Marks | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Charles Hartland | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Keller | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Smith | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE NORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £276.34k | £229.78k | £220.23k | £250.53k | £398.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.89k | £262.35k | £256.36k | £295.15k | £335.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 1ST JUNE 1992 as amended on 21 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF AND EDUCATION OF THE VISUALLY HANDICAPPED BY IMPROVING AND ASSISTING IN AND BY THE USE AND APPLICATION OF ADAPTED OR SPECIALIST COMPUTER HARDWARE AND SOFTWARE AND OTHER TECHNOLOGY OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM OR IN ANY OTHER PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
MBX 102
690 London Road
GRAYS
Essex
RM20 3LD
- Phone:
- 02075881885
- Email:
- info@blindinbusiness.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window