Accounts and annual returns THE EARL OF RUTLAND AND DR FLEMING'S HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity number: 1011963
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 08 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 30 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 June 2014 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 27 May 2014 116 days late
Annual return 31 March 2012 26 April 2013 85 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 25 June 2012 On Time