Financial history THE EARL OF RUTLAND AND DR FLEMING'S HOSPITAL TRUST

Charity number: 1011963
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £65.26k £76.79k £70.26k £73.19k £54.40k
Total expenditure £60.99k £45.50k £127.73k £76.19k £101.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A