INCEST AND SEXUAL ABUSE SURVIVORS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 18 June 1992: Standard registration
- 08 September 1999: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- ISAS (Working name)
- INCEST AND SEXUAL ABUSE SUPPORT (Previous name)
- INCEST AND SEXUAL ABUSE SURVIVORS GROUP (ISAS) (Previous name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 JUNE 1992 AS AMENDED 19 JULY 1995, 17 JUNE 1996, 5 SEPTEMBER 1996 AND 11 JUNE 1998. FURTHER AMENDED 17 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE APPROPRIATE SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING FOR DISTRESSED PEOPLE WHO HAVE HAD SEXUAL EXPERIENCES WITH ADULTS DURING THEIR CHILDHOOD IN ORDER TO ENABLE THEM TO EXPLORE, UNDERSTAND AND FIND NEW WAYS OF COPING WITH THEIR PAST EXPERIENCES AND CURRENT DIFFICULTIES WITH CONSEQUENT IMPROVEMENT TO THEIR PSYCHOLOGICAL WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.