SIGHT BY WINGS UK
Charity Number: 1012031
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ophthalmological services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 July 2015
Total income: £182
Total expenditure: £0
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- Thailand
- Uganda
Governance
Registration history:
- 24 June 1992: Standard registration
- 08 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/07/2011 | 01/07/2012 | 01/07/2013 | 01/07/2014 | 01/07/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.43k | £657 | £663 | £342 | £182 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.17k | £7.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2015 | 18 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 July 2013 | 06 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 July 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 MAY 1992
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EYE SURGERY AND TO CURE AND RELIEVE THE DISABILITIES OF BLINDNESS AND IMPAIRED VISION ESPECIALLY AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED OR ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window