NORTH WARWICKSHIRE & COVENTRY DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for Parents/Guardians of Dyslexic Children and Adults.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 19 June 1992: Standard registration
- NWDA (Working name)
- NORTH WARWICKSHIRE DYSLEXIA ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CARA CRAMP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Georgia Niolaki | Trustee | 13 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MRS K CHETWYND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LESLEY HILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2017 | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.72k | £1.46k | £2.93k | £687 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.43k | £1.92k | £2.94k | £921 | £273 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 253 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 253 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 619 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 619 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 22 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/01/1992 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/2001 AS AMENDED ON 28/06/2006 AS AMENDED ON 27/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS HANDICAPPED BY DYSLEXIA AND TO PROMOTE BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF DYSLEXIA TO THE PUBLIC AT LARGE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Lower Road
Barnacle
COVENTRY
CV7 9LD
- Phone:
- 02476610925
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window