AMIGO TRUST

Charity number: 1012093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Such charitable causes and activities as the Trustees see fit in accordance with the Trust deed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,882
Total expenditure: £1,500

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Dorset
  • Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 June 1992: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
sandra may cox Trustee 22 October 2013
None on record
CHARLES JEREMY WOOD Trustee 27 September 1991
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £2.04k £2.94k £2.40k £2.77k £2.88k
Total expenditure £5.75k £2.00k £800 £7.94k £1.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 26 May 2024 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 08 February 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
MULBERRY TREE FARM
ASH
MARTOCK
SOMERSET
TA12 6NZ
Phone:
01935823597
Website:

No information available