MARY ELIZABETH BARROW PRIZE SCHEME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides prizes to creative art students at the college paid for from the interest generated. The original donation value remains intact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Blackpool
Governance
- 19 March 1993: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Greenall | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alistair Mulvey | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL BROWN | Trustee | 01 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £298 | £50 | £220 | £1.43k | £4.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £400 | £400 | £400 | £300 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 DECEMBER 1992
Charitable objects
TO APPLY THE NET INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND FOR EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY PROVISION OF AN AWARD OR AWARDS TO BE MADE ANUALLY FOR EXCELLENCE IN ILLUSTRATION TO STUDENTS OF THE BLACKPOOL AND THE FYLDE COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BLACKPOOL & THE FYLDE COLLEGE
ASHFIELD ROAD
BLACKPOOL
FY2 0HB
- Phone:
- 01253504380
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window